VA SB496 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0543)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0543)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Special police officers in localities. Repeals the provisions of the Code allowing a circuit court for any locality to appoint special police officers for such locality upon application of the sheriff or chief of police. Under current law, all appointments made pursuant to these provisions became void on September 15, 2004. The changes in this bill do not affect a sheriff's or chief of police's ability to request appointment of a special conservator of the peace.
Title
Police officers, special; repeals provisions allowing a circuit court for any locality to appoint.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0543) | |
2014-04-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 543 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB496ER) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-03-03 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-26 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102777D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1124 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1737 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1746 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 74 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 81 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 752 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |