VA SB503 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0544)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0544)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Notaries; providing advice on immigration; advertising. Prohibits a notary public from offering or providing legal advice to any person in immigration or other legal matters or representing any person in immigration proceedings unless such notary public is an attorney or a federally accredited representative. The bill also restricts misleading notary advertising in languages other than English. The bill also provides for civil penalties and revocation of the notary commission for such unauthorized advertising.
Title
Notaries; legal advice on immigration, etc.,non-English advertising, notice requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0544) | |
2014-04-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 544 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB503ER) |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Title replaced 14105256D-H2 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | House | Passed House with substitute (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute SB503H2 |
2014-02-24 | House | Substitute by Delegate Albo agreed to 14105256D-H2 |
2014-02-24 | House | Floor substitute printed 14105256D-H2 (Albo) |
2014-02-24 | House | Committee substitute 14105069D-H1 rejected |
2014-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-21 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-20 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-17 | House | Committee substitute printed 14105069D-H1 |
2014-02-17 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 14102501D-E |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB503E |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102501D |
Same As/Similar To
HB492 (Same As) 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0783)