VA SB5096 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on August 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-09 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-09 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Child care providers; personal protective equipment during certain declared states of emergency; essential workers; emergency. Provides that during any case in which the Governor has declared a state of emergency related to a communicable disease of public health threat, persons operating or working or volunteering at a child day center or family day home shall be considered essential workers and shall be included in any group afforded priority with regard to access to personal protective equipment during such emergency. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Child care providers; PPE during certain declared states of emergency for essential workers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-09 | House | Left in Education |
2020-09-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-09-17 | House | Read first time |
2020-09-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-08-18 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 08/18/20 20200683D |