VA SB511 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0701)
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0701)
Summary
Natural resources funding. Establishes the Virginia Natural Resources Commitment Fund. The Fund would be capitalized with appropriated funds and moneys from public and private sources. Beginning July 1, 2008, and for the next 10 years moneys in the Fund would be distributed to the Department of Conservation and Recreation's Agricultural Best Management Practices Cost-Share Program for the implementation of agricultural best management practices (BMP). Fifty-seven percent of the moneys are to used for matching grants to implement BMPs on agricultural lands exclusively in the Chesapeake Bay watershed and 38 percent of the moneys would be used for all other lands in the Commonwealth. Five percent of the moneys would be allocated to soil and water conservation districts. This bill is identical to
Title
Natural Resources Commitment Fund; created.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0701) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 701 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB511ER) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-03 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-03 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-03 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB511H1 | |
2008-03-03 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 082596696-H1 | |
2008-03-03 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-29 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-28 | House: Committee substitute printed 082596696-H1 | |
2008-02-27 | House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (23-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | House: Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources(Cox) | |
2008-02-14 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-02-14 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-14 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB511S1 | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 082947352-S1 | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Committee amendment rejected | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 082947352-S1 | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 1-N) | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084336352 |
Same As/Similar To
HB1335 (Same As) 2008-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0643)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB511 |