VA SB5118 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-09 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-09 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Public utilities; Emergency Debt Repayment Plan. Requires every utility providing electric, gas, or water service that is subject to regulation by the State Corporation Commission (the Commission) to develop an Emergency Debt Repayment Plan (EDRP) for residential customers. The bill requires that an EDRP is designed to ensure that debt repayments accrued during a certain state of emergency or a certain service disconnection moratorium, in addition to the customer's regular utility bill are sustainable and affordable for the customer. The bill provides than EDRP will allow for an up to 12-month repayment period and for a customer to roll over remaining debt with any debt accrued under a subsequent state of emergency. The bill prohibits a utility from requiring any new deposit, application fee, or other new type of advance payment before enrolling a customer in an EDRP and from charging any interest, finance charges, or prepayment penalties on the unpaid debt while the customer is enrolled in an EDRP. The bill prohibits a utility from discontinuing service for any customer enrolled in the program provided the customer remains in compliance with the terms of the EDRP and remains current on the customer's current utility bill. The bill requires the Commission to allow for the timely recovery of certain costs resulting from an EDRP for jurisdictional utilities, including through a rate adjustment clause or through base rates and provides that the Commission may apply any applicable earnings test in the Commission rules governing utility rate applications and annual informational filings when assessing the recovery of such costs. The bill provides that it does not confer any additional jurisdiction or authority to the Commission. Public utilities; Emergency Debt Repayment Plan. Requires every utility providing electric, gas, or water service that is subject to regulation by the State Corporation Commission (the Commission) to develop an Emergency Debt Repayment Plan (EDRP) for residential customers. The bill requires that an EDRP is designed to ensure that debt repayments accrued during a certain state of emergency or a certain service disconnection moratorium, in addition to the customer's regular utility bill are sustainable and affordable for the customer. The bill provides than EDRP will allow for an up to 12-month repayment period and for a customer to roll over remaining debt with any debt accrued under a subsequent state of emergency. The bill prohibits a utility from requiring any new deposit, application fee, or other new type of advance payment before enrolling a customer in an EDRP and from charging any interest, finance charges, or prepayment penalties on the unpaid debt while the customer is enrolled in an EDRP. The bill prohibits a utility from discontinuing service for any customer enrolled in the program provided the customer remains in compliance with the terms of the EDRP and remains current on the customer's current utility bill. The bill requires the Commission to allow for the timely recovery of certain costs resulting from an EDRP for jurisdictional utilities, including through a rate adjustment clause or through base rates and provides that the Commission may apply any applicable earnings test in the Commission rules governing utility rate applications and annual informational filings when assessing the recovery of such costs. The bill provides that it does not confer any additional jurisdiction or authority to the Commission. The bill requires each jurisdictional utility to report certain information to the Commission and for the Commission to report such information to the chairs of the House Committees on Labor and Commerce and Appropriations and the Senate Committees on Commerce and Labor and Finance and Appropriations. The bill requires municipal utilities, upon the request of the chairs of such committees to submit a report to such committees. The bill also requires the Commission to submit an additional report to the chairs of the House Committees on Labor and Commerce and Appropriations and the Senate Committees on Commerce and Labor and Finance and Appropriations.
Title
Emergency Debt Repayment Plan; every jurisdictional utility to develop.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (24-Y 12-N 1-A) (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (35-Y 2-N) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 13-N 1-A) (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (12-Y 1-N 2-A) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (8-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (35-Y 2-N) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 13-N 1-A) (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (12-Y 1-N 2-A) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (8-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-09 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-09-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-09-17 | House | Read first time |
2020-09-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (24-Y 12-N 1-A) |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (35-Y 2-N) |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 13-N 1-A) |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20201077D-ES1 |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB5118ES1 |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20201077D-S1 |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (12-Y 1-N 2-A) |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20201077D-S1 |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (8-Y 5-N 1-A) |
2020-08-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-08-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20200398D |