VA SB538 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 681 (effective 7/1/24)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 681 (effective 7/1/24)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Uniform Statewide Building Code; violations; fines. Increases from $2,500 to $5,000 the minimum amount and from $5,000 to $10,000 the maximum amount that any person, firm, or corporation shall be fined when convicted of a third or subsequent offense of violating the provisions of the Uniform Statewide Building Code committed within 10 years of another such offense after having been at least twice previously convicted of such an offense. The bill also adds penalties for similar violations committed by owners of a blighted multifamily property.
Title
Uniform Statewide Building Code; violations, increases fines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (71-Y 28-N) (Y: 71 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 681 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB538ER) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-20 | House | VOTE: Passage (71-Y 28-N) |
2024-02-20 | House | Passed House (71-Y 28-N) |
2024-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-15 | House | Reported from General Laws (17-Y 5-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102774D |
Same As/Similar To
HB578 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0641)