VA SB568 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0646)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0646)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Medical assistance; coverage for certain children and pregnant women. Provides that the Board of Medical Assistance Services shall include a provision in the state plan for medical assistance services for medical assistance for otherwise eligible pregnant women during the first five years of lawful residence in the United States. The bill also requires the Department of Medical Assistance Services to provide coverage under the Family Access to Medical Insurance Security (FAMIS) Plan for otherwise eligible children and pregnant women during the first five years of lawful residence in the United States.
Title
Family Access to Medical Insurance Security Plan; coverage for certain children and pregnant women.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (11-Y 28-N) (Y: 11 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (11-Y 28-N) (Y: 11 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0646) | |
2012-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 646 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-10 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB568ER) | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-03-09 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-09 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-09 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-08 | House: Delegates: O'Bannon, Peace, Brink | |
2012-03-08 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2012-03-07 | Senate: Senators: Carrico, Ebbin, McWaters | |
2012-03-07 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2012-03-07 | Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-06 | House: House requested conference committee | |
2012-03-06 | House: House insisted on amendment | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (11-Y 28-N) | |
2012-03-01 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | House: Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2012-03-01 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2012-03-01 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-29 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-27 | House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | House: Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources | |
2012-02-23 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-23 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2012-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 12103928D-E | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB568E | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 3-N) | |
2012-01-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-01-17 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 12103928D |
Same As/Similar To
HB183 (Same As) 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0689)