VA SB57 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0728)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0728)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Number of district court judges. Increases from seven to eight the number of juvenile and domestic relations district court judges in the 19th Judicial District (Fairfax, Fairfax County) and increases from three to four the number of general district court judges in the 25th Judicial District (Covington, Lexington, Staunton, Buena Vista, Waynesboro, Highland, Augusta, Rockbridge, Bath, Alleghany, Botetourt, and Craig). This bill is a recommendation of the Committee on District Courts.
Title
Judges; increases number in 19th and 25th Judicial Districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Howell [D] | Sen. Creigh Deeds [D] | Sen. George Barker [D] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Sen. Dave Marsden [D] | Sen. John Petersen [D] | Sen. Scott Surovell [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0728) | |
2016-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 728 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2016-03-16 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/16/16 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB57ER) |
2016-03-11 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-09 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-08 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 1-N) |
2016-03-08 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2016-03-08 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-03-08 | House | Read third time |
2016-03-07 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-04 | House | Read second time |
2016-03-02 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-18 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB57S1 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16104448D-S1 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-18 | Senate | Incorporates SB347 |
2016-01-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16104448D-S1 |
2016-01-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2016-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 5-N) |
2015-12-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-12-16 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103022D |
Same As/Similar To
SB347 (Similar To) 2016-01-18 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice