VA SB580 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
School property; airsoft guns; penalty. Provides that it is a Class 1 misdemeanor for a person under the age of 18 to possess on school property a weapon designed to expel a projectile at a speed of more than 250 feet per second by action of compressed air or gas, such as an airsoft gun. The prohibition expires in five years and does not apply to weapons with orange-tips.
Title
Airsoft guns; prohibited on school property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 5-N) (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute reconsidered (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 4-N) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute reconsidered (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 4-N) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2010-02-18 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #1 | |
2010-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 5-N) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB580S2 | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Substitute by Senator Marsden agreed to 10105242D-S2 | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Floor substitute printed 10105242D-S2 (Marsden) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Committee substitute rejected | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Committee substitute reconsidered (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB580S1 | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10104854D-S1 | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10104854D-S1 | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 4-N) | |
2010-01-15 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103404D |