VA SB586 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Passed by for the day
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Passed by for the day
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Public elementary and secondary schools; student discipline; evidence-based restorative disciplinary practices. Prohibits, except in certain cases involving specific offenses enumerated in applicable law or in cases in which the division superintendent or his designee finds that aggravating circumstances, as defined by the Department of Education, exist, any public elementary or secondary school student from being suspended, expelled, or excluded from attendance at school without first considering at least one evidence-based restorative disciplinary practice such as community conferencing, community service, mentoring, a peer jury, peer mediation, positive behavioral interventions and supports, a restorative circle, or the Virginia Tiered Systems of Supports. The bill also requires the Department to add as part of the student behavior and administrative response collection required pursuant to relevant law the use of evidence-based restorative disciplinary practices as a behavioral intervention in order to evaluate the use and effectiveness of such practices.
Title
Public elementary and secondary schools; student discipline, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (49-Y 46-N) (Y: 49 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 47-N) (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (49-Y 46-N) (Y: 49 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 47-N) (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2024-04-08 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB586ER) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2024-03-09 | House | VOTE: Adoption (49-Y 46-N) |
2024-03-09 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (49-Y 46-N) |
2024-03-08 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2024-03-07 | House | Delegates: McQuinn, Cohen, Coyner |
2024-03-07 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senators: Pekarsky, Hashmi, Pillion |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-06 | House | House requested conference committee |
2024-03-06 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2024-03-05 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) |
2024-03-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (51-Y 47-N) |
2024-03-04 | House | Passed House with substitute (51-Y 47-N) |
2024-03-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB586H1 |
2024-03-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24108219D-H1 |
2024-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2024-03-01 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 24108219D-H1 |
2024-02-28 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (12-Y 10-N) |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB586S1 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24106821D-S1 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24106821D-S1 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 6-N) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Assigned Education and Health Sub: Public Education |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103157D |
Same As/Similar To
HB398 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 276.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 277 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 279.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |