VA SB607 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0684)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0684)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Assignment of certain general funds by the Comptroller. Changes the description in the Comptroller's annual report of the allocation of certain surplus general fund balances for nonrecurring expenditures, and for the Transportation Trust Fund, from "designates" to "assigns." The bill also changes the description of such surplus funds from fund balance not otherwise "reserved or designated," to fund balance not otherwise "restricted, committed, or assigned."
Title
Comptroller; changes description in annual report of allocation of surplus general funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0684) | |
2010-04-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 684 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-15 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-13 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB607ER) | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-08 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-08 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-05 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2010-03-04 | House: Read second time | |
2010-03-02 | House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | House: Assigned App. sub: Technology Oversight and Government Activities | |
2010-02-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-08 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB607S1 | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10104698D-S1 | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-01-29 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10104698D-S1 | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-14 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2010-01-14 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 10103356D |