VA SB626 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Carrying concealed handguns; protective orders. Authorizes any person 21 years of age or older who is not prohibited from purchasing, possessing, or transporting a firearm and is protected by an unexpired protective order to carry a concealed handgun for 45 days after the protective order was issued. The bill provides that if the person issued the protective order applies for a concealed handgun permit during such 45-day period, such person will be authorized to carry a concealed handgun for an additional 45 days and be given a copy of the certified application, which shall serve as a de facto concealed handgun permit. The bill requires such person to have the order or certified application and photo identification on his person when carrying a concealed handgun and to display them upon demand by a law-enforcement officer; failure to do so is punishable by a $25 civil penalty.
Title
Carrying concealed handguns; protective orders.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (11-Y 29-N) (Y: 11 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 31-N) (Y: 72 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (11-Y 29-N) (Y: 11 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 31-N) (Y: 72 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Communicated to Governor |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Requires 2/3 affirmative votes of members voting to pass in enrolled form |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (21-Y 19-N) |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (11-Y 29-N) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Governor's substitute printed 16106081D-S1 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2016-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 8, 2016 | |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/1/16 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB626ER) |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-25 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (34-Y 6-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 31-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Passed House with amendment (69-Y 31-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2016-02-23 | House | Pending question ordered |
2016-02-23 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (16-Y 6-N) |
2016-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #1 |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2016-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 3-N) |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 16104069D |
Same As/Similar To
HB766 (Same As) 2016-04-07 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308.01:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.07 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |