VA HB766 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Carrying concealed handguns; protective orders. Authorizes any person 21 years of age or older who is not prohibited from purchasing, possessing, or transporting a firearm and is protected by an unexpired protective order to carry a concealed handgun for 45 days after the protective order was issued. The bill provides that if the person issued the protective order applies for a concealed handgun permit during such 45-day period, such person will be authorized to carry a concealed handgun for an additional 45 days and be given a copy of the certified application, which shall serve as a de facto concealed handgun permit. The bill requires such person to have the order or certified application and photo identification on his person when carrying a concealed handgun and to display them upon demand by a law-enforcement officer; failure to do so is punishable by a $25 civil penalty.
Title
Concealed handguns; carrying with a valid protective order.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: ENROLLED FORM (66-Y 33-N) (Y: 68 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (28-Y 71-N) (Y: 29 N: 73 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 29-N) (Y: 71 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: ENROLLED FORM (66-Y 33-N) (Y: 68 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (28-Y 71-N) (Y: 29 N: 73 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 29-N) (Y: 71 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2016-03-25 | House | Communicated to Governor |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Requires 2/3 affirmative votes of members voting to pass in enrolled form |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (21-Y 19-N) |
2016-03-11 | House | VOTE: ENROLLED FORM (66-Y 33-N) |
2016-03-11 | House | Passed in enrolled form (66-Y 33-N) |
2016-03-11 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (28-Y 71-N) |
2016-03-11 | House | House rejected Governor's recommendation (28-Y 71-N) |
2016-03-11 | House | Pending question ordered |
2016-03-10 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-09 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-07 | House | Governor's substitute printed 16106072D-H1 |
2016-03-07 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2016-02-29 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 7, 2016 | |
2016-02-29 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/29/16 |
2016-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB766ER) |
2016-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 4-N) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-03 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 29-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (68-Y 29-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Printed as engrossed 16100429D-E |
2016-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB766E |
2016-02-02 | House | Pending question ordered |
2016-02-02 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-29 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (16-Y 6-N) |
2016-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-18 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #1 |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100429D |
Same As/Similar To
SB626 (Same As) 2016-04-07 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308.01:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.07 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |