VA SB641 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0641)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0641)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Exemption from reporting citizenship status of prisoners for certain correctional facilities. Provides that a sheriff or other officer in charge of a jail shall communicate the results of any immigration alien query that confirm that a person committed to the jail is illegally present in the United States to the Local Inmate Data System. Currently, the sheriff or other officer must communicate the results of such queries regardless of whether the results confirm that such person is illegally present in the United States.
Title
Correctional facilities, certain; communication of results of immigration alien query.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 2-N) (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 2-N) (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0641) | |
2014-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 641 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB641ER) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Title replaced 14105404D-H1 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 2-N) |
2014-03-05 | House | Passed House with substitute (92-Y 2-N) |
2014-03-05 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB641H1 |
2014-03-05 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14105404D-H1 |
2014-03-05 | House | Read third time |
2014-03-04 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 14105404D-H1 |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 14104008D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Costs, Fees, Salaries, and Allowances
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction
Sheriffs
Costs, Fees, Salaries, and Allowances
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction
Sheriffs