VA SB651 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Courts not of record; jurisdiction of small claims court. Increases from $5,000 to $10,000 the ceiling of the jurisdictional amount of a small claims court.
Title
Small claims court; increases ceiling of jurisdictional amount thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-19 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil | |
2010-02-18 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-18 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-18 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10103949D-E | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB651E | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 10103949D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 122.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 122.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |