VA SB683 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0710)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0710)
Summary
Virginia Commission on Higher Education Board Appointments; sunset. Removes the sunset on the Virginia Commission on Higher Education Board Appointments. This bill incorporates
Title
Higher Education Board Appointments, Commission on; removes sunset provision.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0710) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 710 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB683ER) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-03-04 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB683H1 | |
2008-03-04 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 081876472-H1 | |
2008-03-04 | House: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-29 | House: Committee substitute printed 081876472-H1 | |
2008-02-28 | House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | House: Assigned GL sub: Professional/Occupational/Adminstrative Process | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-24 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-14 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2008-01-14 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 088828284 |
Same As/Similar To
SB302 (Same As) 2008-02-28 - House: Incorporated by General Laws (SB683-Norment) by voice vote
HB776 (Same As) 2008-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0050)
HB776 (Same As) 2008-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0050)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB683 |