VA SB69 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0611)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0611)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transient occupancy tax; Arlington County. Extends from July 1, 2018, to July 1, 2021, the sunset date for the additional one-fourth of one percent transient occupancy tax authorized in Arlington County.
Title
Transient occupancy tax; sunset provision for Arlington County's authority to impose.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (33-Y 5-N) (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 17-N) (Y: 82 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 8-N) (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 17-N) (Y: 82 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 8-N) (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0611) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 611 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB69ER) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-02 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (33-Y 5-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 17-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Passed House with amendment (82-Y 17-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-26 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 5-N) |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 8-N) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100456D |