VA SB690 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0283)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0283)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Chaplains of the Virginia National Guard and Virginia Defense Force; sermons. Prohibits censorship by state government officials or agencies of the religious messages or other speeches within religious services made by chaplains of the Virginia National Guard while in Title 32 or State Active Duty status or of the Virginia Defense Force, so long as (i) the religious content offered is not in any way a precursor of, introduction to, or part of any official ceremony, gathering, or formation that is not part of the religious service; (ii) the content does not urge disobedience of lawful orders; and (iii) members of the Virginia National Guard or Virginia Defense Force are not required to attend the service or event where such content is delivered.
Title
Chaplains of the Virginia National Guard and Virginia Defense Force; sermons.
Sponsors
Sen. John Cosgrove [R] | Sen. George Barker [D] | Sen. John Petersen [D] | Sen. Richard Black [R] |
Del. Thomas Garrett [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0283) | |
2015-03-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 283 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/24/15 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB690ER) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-17 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #2 |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB690S1 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104326D-S1 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Incorporates SB1295 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104326D-S1 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-11-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2014-11-21 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100675D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1295 (Similar To) 2015-01-26 - Incorporated by General Laws and Technology