VA SB712 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0694)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0694)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Branch campus of George Mason University in the Republic of Korea. Authorizes the board of visitors of George Mason University to establish and operate a branch campus of the university in the Republic of Korea. This bill also authorizes the board of visitors to create a corporation or other legal entity, controlled by the board of visitors, to establish and operate the branch campus and allows the board of visitors to pursue planning and development of the branch campus. Certain provisions customary for the establishment of branch campuses of institutions in foreign lands and constitutional protections for Virginians either teaching or matriculating at the branch campus have been included. The corporation that may be created by the board of visitors of George Mason University is deemed a sole source provider under the Virginia Public Procurement Act (§2.2-4300 et seq.). This act will expire on July 1, 2012, if the board of visitors does not create a corporation or other legal entity in accordance with the provisions of this act.
Title
George Mason University; establishment of branch campus in Republic of Korea.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0694) | |
2010-04-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 694 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-05 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB712ER) | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-02-26 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | House: Read third time | |
2010-02-25 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-24 | House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) | |
2010-02-22 | House: Assigned Education sub: #4 Higher Education and Arts | |
2010-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB712S1 | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10104780D-S1 | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10104780D-S1 | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Higher Education | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 10104150D |