VA SB724 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Requires 27 affirmative votes to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Requires 27 affirmative votes to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Education; Common Core State Standards. Prohibits the Board of Education from replacing the educational objectives known as the Standards of Learning with Common Core State Standards without the prior statutory approval of the General Assembly but permits the Board to continue or create an educational standard or assessment that is coincidentally included in the standards referred to as the Common Core State Standards.
Title
SOL; Bd. of Education prohibited from adopting revisions that implement Common Core State Standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (24-Y 13-N) (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 16-N) (Y: 81 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (24-Y 13-N) (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 16-N) (Y: 81 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Requires 27 affirmative votes to override Governor's veto |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate sustained Governor's veto (22-Y 18-N) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2015-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/24/15 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB724ER) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Title replaced 15104973D-H1 |
2015-02-17 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (24-Y 13-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 16-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Passed House with substitute (79-Y 16-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB724H1 |
2015-02-13 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104973D-H1 |
2015-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-11 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104973D-H1 |
2015-02-11 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (19-Y 3-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 17-N) |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Black withdrawn |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100362D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1752 (Same As) 2015-04-15 - Requires 27 affirmative votes to override Governor's veto