VA SB764 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0649)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0649)
Summary
Address confidentiality for victims of domestic violence; program expanded; penalty. Expands the address confidentiality for victims of domestic violence program currently implemented in the County of Arlington to the Counties of Albemarle, Augusta, Dickenson, Fairfax, Henry, Lee, Rockbridge, Russell, Scott, Washington, and Wise as well as the Cities of Buena Vista, Charlottesville, Lexington, Martinsville, Norfolk, and Roanoke. The bill also provides that an applicant to the program may apply in person at a domestic violence program, which is defined as a public and not-for-profit agency the primary mission of which is to provide services to victims of sexual or domestic violence. Currently, such applications are made directly to the Office of the Attorney General.
Title
Address confidentiality for victims of domestic violence; program expanded.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] | Sen. Louise Lucas [D] | Sen. Linda Puller [D] | Sen. Patricia Ticer [D] |
Sen. Mary Whipple [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0649) | |
2008-03-13 | House: Enacted, Chapter 649 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-13 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2008-03-13 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2008-03-13 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB764ER2) | |
2008-03-13 | House: Reenrolled | |
2008-03-13 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2008-03-13 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-13 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-13 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (36-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-12 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-03-12 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB764ER) | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-26 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-26 | House: Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-26 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2008-02-26 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-02-26 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-25 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-22 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendments (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2008-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 080272336-ES1 | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB764ES1 | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Amendment #2 by Senator Cuccinelli withdrawn | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Amendment #1 by Senator Cuccinelli agreed to | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 080272336-S1 | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 080272336-S1 | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Introduced bill reprinted 084725336 | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2008-01-18 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-18 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 084725336 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB764 |