VA SB773 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0543)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0543)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Psychiatric treatment of minors; objecting minor; criteria. Amends the criteria for admitting an objecting minor 14 years of age or older for psychiatric treatment to match the criteria for determining whether a nonobjecting minor or a minor younger than 14 years of age should be admitted. The bill also provides that if a minor 14 years of age or older who did not initially object to treatment objects to further treatment, the mental health facility where the minor is being treated shall immediately notify the parent who consented to the minor's treatment and provide to such parent a summary, prepared by the Office of the Attorney General, of the procedures for requesting continued treatment of the minor.
Title
Psychiatric treatment of minors; objecting minor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0543) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 543 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/24/15 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB773ER) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-17 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 15100950D-E |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB773E |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-12-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-12-23 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100950D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1717 (Same As) 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0504)