VA SB796 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-07 - House: Continued to 2009 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-07 - House: Continued to 2009 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Summary
Elections; emergencies; extension of polling hours. Provides for a court-ordered extension of polling hours in emergency situations and situations that interfere with the ability of voters to travel to the polls. The bill provides that no extension shall exceed three hours.
Title
Polling places; provides for extension of polling hours in emergency situations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-07 | House: Continued to 2009 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote | |
2008-03-05 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2008-03-05 | House: Read first time | |
2008-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Pending question ordered (36-Y 4-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 089508201-ES1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB796ES1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Amendment by Senator McEachin rejected | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Amendment #2 by Senator Barker withdrawn | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Amendment #1 by Senator Barker agreed to | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 089508201-S1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Floor substitute printed 089511216-S3 (Cuccinelli) | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Floor substitute printed 089510216-S2 (Cuccinelli) | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-29 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Read first time | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 089508201-S1 | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (10-Y 5-N) | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 089507802 | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Introduced at the request of Governor |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB796 |