VA SB8 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0463)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0463)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Guardians; disposition of remains. Grants both public and private guardians authority to make arrangements for the funeral and disposition of remains, including cremation, interment, entombment, memorialization, inurnment, or scattering of the cremains, or some combination thereof, if the guardian is not aware of any person that has been otherwise designated to make such arrangements. The bill also clarifies that such guardians may make such arrangements if the next of kin of the deceased does not wish to make the arrangements or cannot be located.
Title
Guardians; disposition of remains.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0463) | |
2012-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 463 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB8ER) | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | House: Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2012-03-01 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-03-01 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-29 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-27 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-19 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-18 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-17 | Senate: Motion to reconsider reading dispensed agreed to (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-16 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-12-16 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-12-16 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100041D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, Department of
Guardian and Ward
Professions and Occupations
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, Department of
Guardian and Ward
Professions and Occupations