VA SB822 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-18 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-18 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Statewide Fire Prevention Code; State Fire Marshal; fees. Changes approval authority over fees that may be charged by the State Fire Marshal to recover enforcement costs from the Board of Housing and Community Development to the Virginia Fire Services Board.
Title
Statewide Fire Prevention Code; fees charged by State Fire Marshal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 5-N) (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-18 | House | Left in General Laws |
2013-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote |
2013-02-06 | House | Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 5-N) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 2-N) |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102633D |