VA SB83 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; absentee voting. Provides that qualified voters may vote absentee in person without providing an excuse or reason for not being able to vote in person on election day. The bill retains the present statutory list of specific reasons entitling a voter to cast an absentee ballot for those persons who vote absentee by mail.
Title
Absentee voting; qualified voters to provide a reason for not being able to vote on election day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | House: Left in Privileges and Elections | |
2010-03-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2010-02-19 | House: Assigned P & E sub: #2 Elections | |
2010-02-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2010-02-17 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-01-21 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-19 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 3-N) | |
2010-01-05 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2010-01-05 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100369D |