VA SB886 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0427)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0427)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; clarifications related to absentee voting and identification required for certain first-time voters. Provides that certain voter registrations remain valid until the next November general election or federal general election, whichever is later, rather than for 365 days or a federal election cycle. The bill also requires absentee ballots to be available 45 days prior to the election or three business days after receipt of the completed application, whichever is later; and makes other technical changes.
Title
Elections; clarifications related to absentee voting and identification required.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 37-N) (Y: 3 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 37-N) (Y: 3 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0427) | |
2011-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 427 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB886ER) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-25 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-25 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-25 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-25 | Senate: Conference substitute printed 11105619D-S2 | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Senators: Martin, Puckett, Barker | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2011-02-24 | House: Delegates: Cosgrove, Anderson, Alexander | |
2011-02-24 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: House requested conference committee | |
2011-02-24 | House: House insisted on substitute | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 37-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Passed House with substitute (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB886H1 | |
2011-02-22 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11105377D-H1 | |
2011-02-22 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-21 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-18 | House: Committee substitute printed 11105377D-H1 | |
2011-02-18 | House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (20-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Assigned P & E sub: #2 Elections | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB886S1 | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104469D-S1 | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Incorporates SB1252 | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104469D-S1 | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-14 | Senate: Assigned to P&E sub: Campaigns and Elections | |
2011-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2011-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102405D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1252 (Similar To) 2011-01-25 - Senate: Incorporated by Privileges and Elections (SB886-Martin) (15-Y 0-N)
HB1858 (Same As) 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0458)
HB1858 (Same As) 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0458)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 442 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 443.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 612 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 643 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 702.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |