VA SB914 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0552)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0552)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Retention of court case files. Requires that the circuit court case files on crimes for which a person can be committed as a sexually violent predator be retained for 50 years or until the sentence term ends, whichever comes later. Juvenile court records for such crimes must already be retained for 50 years.
Title
Sexually violent predator offenses; retention of court case files.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0552) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 552 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB914ER) |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Title replaced 15105187D-H1 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB914H1 |
2015-02-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15105187D-H1 |
2015-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-20 | House | Committee substitute printed 15105187D-H1 |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100555D |