VA SB954 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0551)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0551)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Juvenile work programs. Adds additional members to the committee that reviews agreements with a public or private entity for the operation of a work program for juveniles committed to the Department of Juvenile Justice. In addition, the bill requires the committee to develop and submit to the Department a plan for the establishment of a network of businesses willing to employ juveniles released from the Department's commitment. The provisions of this act shall become effective on July 1, 2012.
Title
Juvenile work programs; adds additional members to committee reviewing those employing offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0551) | |
2011-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 551 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB954ER) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-22 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-21 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-18 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-18 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #3 | |
2011-02-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2011-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-09 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 11101672D-E | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB954E | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Assigned Rehab sub: Corrections | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101672D |