VA SB969 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0621)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0621)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Lewd and lascivious cohabitation. Eliminates by repeal the crime of lewd and lascivious cohabitation by unmarried persons and the crime of open and gross lewdness and lasciviousness.
Title
Lewd and lascivious cohabitation; eliminates crime.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 25-N) (Y: 62 N: 27 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0621) | |
2013-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 621 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB969ER) |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-20 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 25-N) |
2013-02-20 | House | Passed House (62-Y 25-N) |
2013-02-20 | House | Motion to rerefer to Courts of Justice committee rejected |
2013-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal |
2013-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB969S1 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 13104663D-S1 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 13104663D-S1 |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103511D |