VA SB971 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0743)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0743)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Interstate 81 Corridor Improvement Plan. Directs the Commonwealth Transportation Board to develop and adopt an Interstate 81 Corridor Improvement plan and evaluate financing options for Interstate 81 corridor improvements.
Title
Interstate 81 Corridor Improvement Plan; Commonwealth Transportation Board to develop.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 3-N) (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (67-Y 30-N 1-A) (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendment (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 3-N) (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (67-Y 30-N 1-A) (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendment (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0743) | |
2018-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 743 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB971ER) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-10 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 3-N) |
2018-03-10 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (92-Y 3-N) |
2018-03-10 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2018-03-08 | House | Delegates: O'Quinn, Rush, Bagby |
2018-03-08 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senators: Obenshain, McDougle, Reeves |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (38-Y 1-N) |
2018-03-08 | House | House requested conference committee |
2018-03-08 | House | House insisted on amendments |
2018-03-08 | Senate | House amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2018-03-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) |
2018-03-07 | House | Passed House with amendments (95-Y 3-N) |
2018-03-07 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (67-Y 30-N 1-A) |
2018-03-07 | House | Amendments by Delegate Wilt agreed to (67-Y 30-N 1-A) |
2018-03-07 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-03-07 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-05 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from Rules with amendment (17-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB971S1 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18105905D-S1 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18105905D-S1 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Transportation |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Rereferred from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18105701D |