VA SB980 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (42-Y 54-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (42-Y 54-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transient occupancy tax; Arlington County. Extends the sunset date for the additional transient occupancy tax in Arlington County from January 1, 2012, to January 1, 2015. Current law requires that the revenues from the tax be designated and spent for promoting tourism and business travel in the county.
Title
Transient occupancy tax; extends sunset date provision for additional tax in Arlington County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (42-Y 54-N) (Y: 42 N: 56 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 7-N) (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 7-N) (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | House: VOTE: DEFEATED (42-Y 54-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Defeated by House (42-Y 54-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Amendment by Delegate Albo withdrawn | |
2011-02-22 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-02-22 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-21 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-18 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-17 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-16 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-15 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-14 | House: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 8-N) | |
2011-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #2 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 7-N) | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-20 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-19 | Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102335D |