VA SJR155 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ155ER)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ155ER)
Summary
Commemorating the 100th anniversary of the Order Sons of Italy in America.
Title
Commemorating the 100th anniversary of the Order Sons of Italy in America.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-17 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ155ER) | |
2008-02-15 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2008-02-14 | House: Laid on Speaker's table | |
2008-02-14 | House: Received | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Introduced bill reprinted 085124348 | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Presented 085124348 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SJ155 |