VA SJR160 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ160ER)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ160ER)
Summary
Confirming Governor's appointments; agency heads and certain persons. Confirms appointments made by Governor Kaine during the 2008 Session of agency heads and other persons and communicated to the General Assembly January 31, 2008.
Title
Governor; confirming appointments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-17 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ160ER) | |
2008-03-04 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N 2-A) | |
2008-03-04 | House: Agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N 2-A) | |
2008-03-04 | House: Taken up | |
2008-02-29 | House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-27 | House: Assigned P & E sub: Appointments | |
2008-02-26 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2008-02-26 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Read first time | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 087690814 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SJ160 |