VA SJR256 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0719)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0719)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (first resolution); charter schools. Grants the Board of Education authority, subject to criteria and conditions prescribed by the General Assembly, to establish charter schools within the school divisions of the Commonwealth.
Title
Constitutional amendment (first resolution); charter schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (58-Y 42-N) (Y: 60 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 9-N) (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Pending question ordered (32-Y 5-N) (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 9-N) (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Pending question ordered (32-Y 5-N) (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0719) | |
2015-03-27 | House | Assigned Chapter 719 (effective - see bill) |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ256ER) |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (58-Y 42-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Agreed to by House (58-Y 42-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Taken up |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 9-N) |
2015-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional Amendments |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Pending question ordered (32-Y 5-N) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to P&E sub: Constitutional Amendments |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100782D |