VA SJR334 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ334ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ334ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; expansion of the Chesapeake Bay Watershed Nutrient Credit Exchange Program; report. Requests that the Secretary of Natural Resources study the expansion of the Chesapeake Bay Watershed Nutrient Credit Exchange Program. In conducting its study, the Secretary of Natural Resources shall convene a stakeholder committee to include representatives from the nutrient source sectors identified in the Chesapeake Bay Total Maximum Daily Load, private sector interests with experience and expertise in market-based approaches and nutrient credits and trading, state agency personnel, local governments, conservation and environmental organizations, and any other persons deemed by the Secretary to have relevant knowledge, perspective, or experience.
Title
Chesapeake Bay Watershed Nutrient Credit Exchange Program; Secretary of Natural Resources to study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ334ER) | |
2011-02-24 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Taken up | |
2011-02-21 | House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-10 | House: Assigned Rules sub: #3 Studies | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Reported from Rules by voice vote | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Assigned Rules sub: #1 | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101359D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Chesapeake Bay
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Waters of the State, Ports, and Harbors
Chesapeake Bay
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Waters of the State, Ports, and Harbors