VA SJR424 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ424ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Kristallnacht. Remembers the 80th anniversary of Kristallnacht.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commemorating the 80th anniversary of Kristallnacht.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SJ424ER)
2019-02-23HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23HouseAgreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23HouseTaken up for immediate consideration
2019-02-22HouseReported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
2019-02-22HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-02-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-21SenateRead third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
2019-02-21SenatePrinted as engrossed 19101984D-E
2019-02-20SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SJ424E
2019-02-20SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-20SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-02-20SenateRead second time
2019-02-19SenateRead first time
2019-02-18SenateReported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-02-14SenatePresented and ordered printed 19101984D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback