VA SJR82 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ82ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ82ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Confirming Governor's appointments; January 26. Confirms appointments of certain persons made by Governor Glenn Youngkin and communicated to the General Assembly January 26, 2024.
Title
Governor; confirming appointments.
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Rouse [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ82ER) |
2024-03-06 | House | VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-06 | House | Agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-06 | House | Taken up |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 24106375D |
Same As/Similar To
SJR31 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Bill text as passed Senate and House reprinted (SJ31ER)
SJR32 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Bill text as passed Senate and House reprinted (SJ32ER)
SJR33 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ33ER)
SJR34 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Bill text as passed Senate and House reprinted (SJ34ER)
SJR36 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ36ER)
SJR32 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Bill text as passed Senate and House reprinted (SJ32ER)
SJR33 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ33ER)
SJR34 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Bill text as passed Senate and House reprinted (SJ34ER)
SJR36 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ36ER)