VA SJR98 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-13 - House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (44-Y 47-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-13 - House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (44-Y 47-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Joint Subcommittee to Study the Feasibility of Creating a Regional Rapid Transit Network for Connecting Existing and Emerging Population Centers in Major Transportation Corridors; report. Continues the work of the joint subcommittee for a third year.
Title
Regional rapid transit network; continues mandate of study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-13 - House - House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (44-Y 47-N) (Y: 44 N: 49 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-13 | House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (44-Y 47-N) | |
2010-03-13 | House: Rejected by House (44-Y 47-N) | |
2010-03-13 | House: Taken up | |
2010-03-12 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2010-03-11 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2010-03-10 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2010-03-09 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2010-03-04 | House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Assigned Rules sub: #3 Studies | |
2010-02-18 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-02-18 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-18 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Reported from Rules by voice vote | |
2010-01-18 | Senate: Assigned Rules sub: Studies | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101037D |