VT H0350 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the Uniform Directed Trust Act
Title
An act relating to the Uniform Directed Trust Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2024-04-26 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Hashim for Committee on Judiciary, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-24 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-20 | House | Read third time and passed |
2024-03-20 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2024-03-19 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2024-03-19 | House | Rep. Taylor of Colchester recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-03-19 | House | Rep. Andriano of Orwell reported for the Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-19 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-19 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable |
2024-03-15 | House | Rep. LaLonde of South Burlington moved to postpone action until 03/19/2024, which was agreed to |
2024-03-15 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable |
2024-03-14 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable |
2024-02-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2024-02-27 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary |