VT H0563 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to criminal motor vehicle offenses involving unlawful trespass, theft, or unauthorized operation
Title
An act relating to criminal motor vehicle offenses involving unlawful trespass, theft, or unauthorized operation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-04-26 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment |
2024-04-25 | House | Senate proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Burditt of West Rutland and LaLonde of South Burlington |
2024-04-25 | House | Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2024-04-24 | House | Rep. Burditt of West Rutland moved to postpone action until 4/25/2024, which was agreed to |
2024-04-24 | House | Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2024-04-23 | House | Action Calendar: Action postponed until 4/24/2024 |
2024-04-22 | House | Action Calendar: Action postponed until 4/24/2024 |
2024-04-19 | House | Rep. Burditt of West Rutland moved to postpone action until 4/24/2024, which was agreed to |
2024-04-19 | House | Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2024-04-18 | House | Notice Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2024-04-17 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2024-04-16 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2024-04-12 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Hashim for Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation |
2024-04-12 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-02-14 | House | Read third time and passed |
2024-02-14 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2024-02-13 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2024-02-13 | House | Report of Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2024-02-13 | House | Rep. Burditt of West Rutland reported for the Committee on Judiciary |
2024-02-13 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-13 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-02-09 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2024-01-03 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary |