VT H0663 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2-1)
Status: Passed on October 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-05 - House message: Governor approved bill on October 5, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to expanding access to contraceptives

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to expanding access to contraceptives

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-05SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on October 5, 2020
2020-10-05HouseSigned by Governor on October 5, 2020
2020-09-30HouseDelivered to the Governor on September 30, 2020
2020-09-22HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
2020-09-21SenateHouse proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in
2020-09-21SenateHouse proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text
2020-09-21SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2020-09-19SenateHouse proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment
2020-09-19SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-09-18SenateHouse message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment
2020-09-18HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-09-18HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. McFaun of Barre Town, Brumsted of Shelburne, Gregoire of Fairfield, Haas of Rochester, Nicoll of Ludlow, Noyes of Wolcott, Pajala of Londonderry, Pugh of South Burlington, Redmond of Essex, and Wood of Waterbury
2020-09-03HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2020-09-02SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2020-09-02SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2020-09-01Senate3rd reading ordered
2020-09-01SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to
2020-09-01SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Ingram for Committee on Health and Welfare
2020-09-01SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2020-09-01SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2020-08-28SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2020-08-28SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-03-24SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare
2020-03-13HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-03-13HouseRead Third time and Passed
2020-03-12HouseThird Reading Ordered
2020-03-12HouseReport of Committee on Human Services agreed to.
2020-03-12HouseRep. McFaun of Barre Town reported for the committee on Human Services
2020-03-12HouseRead Second Time
2020-01-14HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback