VT HCR197 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-5-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Adopted pursuant to Joint Rule 16b
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-5-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Adopted pursuant to Joint Rule 16b
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House concurrent resolution designating April 3, 2024 as Prevention Day in Vermont
Title
House concurrent resolution designating April 3, 2024 as Prevention Day in Vermont
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-29 | House | Adopted pursuant to Joint Rule 16b |
2024-04-03 | House | Ceremonial Reading |
2024-03-29 | House | Senate Message, adopted in concurrence |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Adopted in concurrence per Joint Rule 16b |
2024-03-29 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2024-03-28 | House | On Consent Calendar |