VT S0149 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 14, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 14, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to miscellaneous changes to laws related to vehicles and the Department of Motor Vehicles
Title
An act relating to miscellaneous changes to laws related to vehicles and the Department of Motor Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 14, 2019 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 14, 2019 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on June 11, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate message, report of committee of conference adopted |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-22 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Ashe for Committee, text |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House message House adopted Conference Committee report |
2019-05-22 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-22 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (Senate bill) |
2019-05-14 | Senate | House message House appointed Conference Committee members |
2019-05-14 | House | Speaker appointed McCormack of Burlington, Murphy of Fairfax and Savage of Swanton as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2019-05-13 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment not concurred in and committee of conference appointed |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Ashe, Mazza, and Kitchel |
2019-05-13 | Senate | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-13 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-03 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-02 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-05-02 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2019-04-30 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2019-04-30 | House | Which was agreed to |
2019-04-30 | House | Rep. Till of Jericho moved to amend the House proposal of amendment. |
2019-04-26 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-04-26 | House | Report of Committee on Transportation as amended agreed to |
2019-04-26 | House | Rep. Haas of Rochester asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2019-04-26 | House | Rep. Haas of Rochester and Shaw of Pittsford moved to amend the report of the committee on Transportation |
2019-04-26 | House | Report of the Committee on Transportation amended as offered by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2019-04-26 | House | Rep. Savage of Swanton moved to amend the report of the committee on Transportation |
2019-04-26 | House | Rep. Beck of St. Johnsbury recommended for the committee on Ways and Means |
2019-04-26 | House | Rep. McCormack of Burlington reported for the committee on Transportation |
2019-04-26 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-04-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2019-04-03 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Transportation |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2019-03-29 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Brock for Committee on Finance |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48 |