WA HB1077 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning courthouse facility dogs.
Title
Concerning courthouse facility dogs.
Sponsors
Rep. My-Linh Thai [D] | Rep. Amy Walen [D] | Rep. Tarra Simmons [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] |
Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-13 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-13 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-13 | House | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-04-13 | House | Chapter 59, 2023 Laws. |
2023-04-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-04-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 6:00 PM. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2023-02-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-02-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-02-28 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. |
2023-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-01-13 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-01-13 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2022-12-23 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |