WA HB1125 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing hydroelectric generation as a renewable energy resource.
Title
Recognizing hydroelectric generation as a renewable energy resource.
Sponsors
Rep. Cary Condotta [R] | Rep. Larry Crouse [R] | Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Rep. Bradley Klippert [R] |
Sen. James McCune [R] | Rep. Joe Schmick [R] | Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. David Taylor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-01-12 | First reading, referred to Environment. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1125&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1125.pdf |