WA HB1165 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the Washington credit union act.
Title
Concerning the Washington credit union act.
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Rep. Larry Hoff [R] |
Rep. Kirsten Harris-Talley [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-11 | House | Chapter 15, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | BFST - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade. |
2022-01-26 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 84; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-01-26 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-01-26 | House | Committee amendment |
2022-01-25 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-13 | House | CPB - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-01-13 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2022-01-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2021-04-25 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | BFST - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade. |
2021-02-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2021-02-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-01-21 | House | CPB - Majority; do pass. |
2021-01-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31 | 12 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 12 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 12 | 404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 12 | 436 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 12 | 438 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |