WA HB1179 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the revised uniform unclaimed property act.
Title
Concerning the revised uniform unclaimed property act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-14 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-14 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-14 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |