WA HB1195 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-10 - Effective date 5/10/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-10 - Effective date 5/10/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing provisions relating to filling unexpired terms.
Title
Repealing provisions relating to filling unexpired terms.
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Vincent Buys [R] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] |
Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-28 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-28 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-28 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-10 | House | Effective date 5/10/2013. |
2013-05-10 | House | Chapter 195, 2013 Laws. |
2013-05-10 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-05-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-04-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-04-28 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 94; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2013-04-28 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:45 PM. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | GOV - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 8:00 AM. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
2013-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-07 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-05 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-03-01 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-25 | House | APPG - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-25 | House | APPG - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-23 | House | Public hearing, executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government & Information Technology at 9:00 AM. |
2013-02-15 | House | Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government. |
2013-02-12 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-12 | House | GOE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-12 | House | GOE - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-12 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2013-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 10:00 AM. |
2013-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. |