WA HB1231 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the prevailing rate of wage based on collective bargaining agreements or other methods if collective bargaining agreements are not available.
Title
Establishing the prevailing rate of wage based on collective bargaining agreements or other methods if collective bargaining agreements are not available.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-16 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
2016-02-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 50; nays, 48; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-15 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-01-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-01-19 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2016-01-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2016-01-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-03-13 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-05 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-01-29 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-01-29 | House | LAB - Majority; do pass. |
2015-01-29 | House | LAB - Executive action taken by committee. |
2015-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Labor |
Same As/Similar To
SB6573 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.